This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/23/2021 at 01:26:12 (UTC).

KING, RACHEL V BYJOY CONSULTANTS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 KING, RACHEL filed an Other lawsuit against BYJOY CONSULTANTS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GILLMAN , PAIGE and PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GILLMAN , PAIGE

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

KING , RACHEL

Respondents and Defendants

BYJOY CONSULTANTS LLC

ALBU , JOYCE

BYMEL , WILLIAM J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FULTON IV, ANDREW

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GRAZI ESQ, RYAN S

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS.... -JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 2/11/2021

02/12/2021:ORDER ON DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS.... -JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 2/11/2021

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/11/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING

RETURNED MAIL

02/03/2021:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER ON SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION WITH DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES FOR MANDATORY REMOTE APPEARANCE ON 2/11/21 @1PM JUDGE PARNFIELLO ON 1/27/2021

01/27/2021:ORDER ON SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION WITH DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES FOR MANDATORY REMOTE APPEARANCE ON 2/11/21 @1PM JUDGE PARNFIELLO ON 1/27/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/19/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/05/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/15/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/15/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED ON 12/7/20 BY JDG. P. GILLMAN

12/07/2020:AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED ON 12/7/20 BY JDG. P. GILLMAN

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/07/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/19/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/19/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

COMPLAINT

11/10/2020:COMPLAINT

PAID $430.00 ON RECEIPT 3808889

11/13/2020:PAID $430.00 ON RECEIPT 3808889

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS.... -JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 2/11/2021; Notes:ON DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS.... -JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 2/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:SPECIALLY SETTING REMOTE EVIDENTIARY HRG ON 2/23/21 AT 2:45 PM VIA ZOOM. DATED 2/11/21 J. PARNOFIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:WILLIAM J BYMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION WITH DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES FOR MANDATORY REMOTE APPEARANCE ON 2/11/21 @1PM JUDGE PARNFIELLO ON 1/27/2021; Notes:ON SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION WITH DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES FOR MANDATORY REMOTE APPEARANCE ON 2/11/21 @1PM JUDGE PARNFIELLO ON 1/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 02/11/2021 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:E-FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOYCE ALBU - 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED BYJOY CONSULTANTS, LLC - 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED ON 12/7/20 BY JDG. P. GILLMAN; Notes:GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED ON 12/7/20 BY JDG. P. GILLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/13/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/13/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/13/2020; Description:4F07FF County Civil Claim > $15000 <= $30000; Amount Due:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $430.00 ON RECEIPT 3808889; Notes:$430.00 3808889 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@kelleylawoffice.com JOYCE ALBU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@kelleylawoffice.com WILLIAM J BYMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@kelleylawoffice.com BYJOY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FULTON, ANDREW