This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2022 at 00:54:06 (UTC).

KERSHNER, BERNARD V RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 KERSHNER, BERNARD filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

KERSHNER , BERNARD

Defendant and Respondent

RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROBES , THOMAS A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

COMPLAINT

12/07/2021:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/07/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

12/07/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4276097

12/09/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4276097

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/07/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/01/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:PLTFS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC - 1/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@robeslawgroup.com;Trobes@robeslawgroup.com;jhernandez@robeslawgroup.com AS TO DFT RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4276097; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/09/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/09/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4276097; Notes:$411.00 4276097 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY ROBES OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes:eservice@robeslawgroup.com;Trobes@robeslawgroup.com;jhernandez@robeslawgroup.com CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT, LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT, LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less