This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/08/2023 at 02:44:07 (UTC).

KEMBA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION INC V BEDFORD, CHARLES T

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 KEMBA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEDFORD, CHARLES T. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KEMBA FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION INC

Defendant and Respondent

BEDFORD , CHARLES T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AVRUTIS , THOMAS L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4761617

01/31/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4761617

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/09/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/02/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER RESETTING

03/06/2023:ORDER RESETTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/6/2023 1:00 PM; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/6/2023 1:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING; Notes: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 6 2023 @ 1PM -JUDGE TEW 3/06/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT'S ATTY PRESENT; DFT NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHARLES T BEDFORD - 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4761617; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@HODGESAVRUTIS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/2/2023 2:15 PM TEW, STEPHANIE; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/2/2023 2:15 PM TEW, STEPHANIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4761617; Notes: $185.00 4761617 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less