This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/10/2023 at 00:53:58 (UTC).

KARAS, NINA WACHS

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 KARAS, NINA WACHS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURTON , CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURTON , CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DAVIS , ILANA

WACHS , SCOTT

Decedent

KARAS , NINA WACHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RITTER , GREGORY J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes: DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketREPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: RITTER, GREGORY J; Notes: REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: RITTER, GREGORY J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER: DAVIS, ILANA; Notes: Petitioner: DAVIS, ILANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 33848 PAGE 719-719; Notes: DTD 09/13/22 S/B JDG BURTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes: CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF INTESTATE ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes: ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4581560; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $346.00; total Amount Paid: $346.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/19/2022; Description: 502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due: $346.00; Amount Paid: $346.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketPAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 4581560; Notes: $346.00 4581560 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B ILANA DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes: F/B ILANA DAVIS & SCOTT WACHS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes: F/B ILANA DAVIS & SCOTT WACHS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes: F/B ILANA DAVIS & SCOTT WACHS E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: OF HEIRSHIP F/B ILANA DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: OF HEIRSHIP F/B SCOTT WACHS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes: F/B ILANA DAVIS & SCOTT WACHS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less