Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 05/04/2021 at 17:32:25 (UTC).

KANIGE, KENNETH ROBERT

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 KANIGE, KENNETH ROBERT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KANIGE , KENNETH C

Decedent

KANIGE , KENNETH ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHWARTZ , ROBERT D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:KERNER: DTD 4-21-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:F/B ATTY. SCHWARTZ OBO PETR, KENNETH C. KANIGE ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF MARGUERITE KANIGE F/B ATTY. SCHWARTZ OBO PETR, KENNETH C. KANIGE ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF VALERIE SAGUTO F/B ATTY. SCHWARTZ OBO PETR, KENNETH C. KANIGE ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B ATTY. SCHWARTZ OBO PETR, KENNETH C. KANIGE ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3969264; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/31/2021; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3969264; Notes:$401.00 3969264 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF MARGUERITE KANIGE FROM NEW YORK E-FILED F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF VALERIE SAGUTO FROM FLORIDA E-FILED F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:E-FILED F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUNEXECUTED NOTICE OF CREDITORS; Notes:F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF P/R, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT & ACCEPTANCE F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B KENNETH C. KANIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ , ROBERT D