Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/07/2021 at 12:07:06 (UTC).

KANHAI, ROHAN V WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 KANHAI, ROHAN filed an Other lawsuit against WAL MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMALL , LISA and SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMALL , LISA

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KANHAI , GUAVIN B

KANHAI , ROHAN

Defendant and Respondent

WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCLOSKEY , SHAWN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , JACKELINE S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

01/18/2021:NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/29/2020:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/29/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/29/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

11/18/2020:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/18/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

07/14/2020:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

07/14/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

07/14/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/10/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/10/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/10/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/01/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/28/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/14/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/14/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/14/2020:COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:DEFENDANT'S RE-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF GUAVIN B. KANHAI GUAVIN B. KANHAI 03/04/2021 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF GUAVIN B. KANHAI 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF GUAVIN B. KANHAI GUAVIN B. KANHAI 03/02/2021 10:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 5 AND 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.'S NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Notes:WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.'S NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes:DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/15/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3628680; Notes:$411.00 3628680 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT WAL MART STORES EAST LP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DFT WAL MART STORES EAST LP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PROPOUNDING SLIP AND FALL TO DFT WAL MART STORES EAST LP F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@SCHWEDLAWFIRM.COM;SMCCLOSKEY@SCHWEDLAWFIRM.COM AS TO WAL MART STORES EAST LP EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY JASON DOLLARD OBO PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ, JACKELINE SOFIA