Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/25/2021 at 17:47:43 (UTC).

KAMINSKI, NICHOLAS V PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 KAMINSKI, NICHOLAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KAMINSKI , FRANCESCA

KAMINSKI , NICHOLAS

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO-MARTINEZ , LEA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PEREZ , JENNIFER C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/21/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990570

04/16/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990570

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/15/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/15/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/15/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B JENNIFER C. PEREZ ESQ., OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3990570; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990570; Notes:$411.00 3990570 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(INITIAL) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:lcastro@flplg.com;eservice@flplg.com;aburgos@flplg.com PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEREZ , JENNIFER C