This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 01/14/2019 at 17:32:23 (UTC).

KALMAN, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 KALMAN, ANDREW was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER , KAREN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER , KAREN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEWTON JR, FRANIS J

Decedent

KALMAN , ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DTD 01/03/19 S/B JDG MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITIONER: NEWTON, FRANIS J JR; Notes:Petitioner: NEWTON, FRANIS J JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • ORDER DENYING DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY-JDG K MILLER DTD 12/26/18 BOOK 30332 PAGE 1177-1177; Notes:DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY-JDG K MILLER DTD 12/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:UNCLAIMED PROPERTY - F/B STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CODICIL; Notes:STATEMETN OF CORRECTION LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT ORIG DTD 2/28/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • WILL; Notes:ORIG DTD 12/7/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B FRANIS NEWTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF HEIRSHIP - F/B FRANCIS NEWTON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DISPO PERS PROPERTY W/O ADMIN; Notes:F/B FRANIS NEWTON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • PAID $238.00 ON RECEIPT 2953653; Notes:$238.00 2953653 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:II: North Branch Probate, MH, Guardianship - II (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Receipt Number:2953653; Receipt Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Receipt Number:2953653; Receipt Amount: $232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$238.00; total Amount Paid:$238.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Due Date:12/10/2018; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$6.00; Amount Paid:$6.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Due Date:12/10/2018; Description:503FF Disposition of Personal Property $232; Amount Due:$232.00; Amount Paid:$232.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less