This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 22:53:45 (UTC).

JULES, ETAMCI V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 JULES, ETAMCI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JULES , ETAMCI

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ALEMANY , JOANNA M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CAMPBELL , LINDA L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/29/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/29/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/29/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/29/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/29/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4449127

05/02/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4449127

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/04/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/04/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/13/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/24/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY CAMPBELL OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4449127; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/02/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/02/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4449127; Notes: $411.00 4449127 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DUCES TECUM DATE/TIME TBD F/B ATTY JOANNA M ALEMANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: OF DOCUMENTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: YIA2@yourinsuranceattorney.com;eservice@yourinsuranceattorney.com AS TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alemany, Joanna M, ESQ