This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/20/2019 at 23:40:15 (UTC).

JUE, WANG V PALM HOUSE LLC

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 JUE, WANG filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PALM HOUSE LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JUN , CHEN

DANQING , LIU

MENYANG , SUN

CHENGLIN , LIU

LI , GAO

LI , CHENG

XIANG , LI

Defendants and Respondents

SOUTH ATLANTIC REGIONAL CENTER LLC

PALM HOUSE HOTEL LLLP

NEW HAVEN CONTRACTING SOUTH INC

NJL DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

KK PB FINANCIAL LLC

STRAUB , GLENN

PALM HOUSE LLC

BONAVENTURE 22 LLC

MATTHEWS , GERRY

PALM HOUSE PB LLC

SILVER LEAF PARTNERS LLC

WALSH , JOSEPH

LAUDANO , NICHOLAS

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WHITE , GAVIN N L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZINK , LARRY A

KAMMERER , CHRISTOPHER W

GLASS , ROBERT C

RABIN , ADAM T

Other Attorneys

FELDMAN , ANDREW SIMMONS

STUDLEY , RACHEL

ELDER , GREGORY R

PRUSS ESQ, LORENZ MICHEL

CARDENAS , M CRISTINA

EVANS , JASON D

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/17/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER

03/15/2019:ANSWER

ANSWER

03/15/2019:ANSWER

CLERK'S DEFAULT

03/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

03/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/28/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/10/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/07/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2018:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921398

11/14/2018:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921398

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921340

11/14/2018:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921340

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921251

11/14/2018:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2921251

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2919971

11/14/2018:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2919971

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/13/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/13/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/06/2018:COMPLAINT

168 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 8/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 8/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RE-SCHEDULING OF PLT'S DEPO SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 12, 2019 (F/B DFT KK-PB FINANCIAL AND GLENN F. STRAUB); Notes:OF RE-SCHEDULING OF PLT'S DEPO SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 12, 2019 (F/B DFT KK-PB FINANCIAL AND GLENN F. STRAUB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:9/19/19 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING ROWE DTD 8/5/19: PLTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DENIED AS AN EMERGENCY; Notes:ROWE DTD 8/5/19: PLTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DENIED AS AN EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Notes:FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER F/B PLTS UP 8/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:GAVINWHITE@WILSONELSER.COM AS TO J MARCUS PAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:GARINWHITE@WILSONELSER.COM AS TO NICHOLAS LAUDANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA ISSUED; Notes:WEISS, HANDLER & CORNWELL, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA ISSUED; Notes:C BROOKS RICCA, JR & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Due Date:11/14/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Due Date:11/09/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Due Date:11/09/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less