This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/29/2021 at 19:26:06 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. V SIERRA, RICARDO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIERRA, RICARDO. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRISTOW , APRIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRISTOW , APRIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

SIERRA , RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PALMA , JORGE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4259957

11/24/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4259957

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6L (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE RICARDO SIERRA, JR - 12/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4259957; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/5/2022 2:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/5/2022 2:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4259957; Notes:$310.00 4259957 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.