This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 10:45:38 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. V HAAS, JOHN H

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed an Other lawsuit against HAAS, JOHN H. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

HAAS , JOHN H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ANDREU , JUAN G

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FULTON IV, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/26/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

10/26/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

10/26/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4227363

10/27/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4227363

COMPLAINT

10/26/2021:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/19/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/01/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING

12/21/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT

12/21/2021:AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR MEDIATION

12/30/2021:MOTION FOR MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING

01/20/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

02/04/2022:MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33321 PAGE 1568-1568

02/15/2022:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33321 PAGE 1568-1568

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33321 PAGE 1568-1568; Notes:RATIFYING STIPULATION AND WITH DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - SIGNED JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 2/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT; Notes:TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:FB PLT- PLAINTIFFS DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR MEDIATION; Notes:MOTION FOR COURT ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:FB DFT'S ATTY ANDRES FULTON , IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOHN H HAAS - 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/27/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/27/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4227363; Notes:$310.00 4227363 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@andreupalma.com;kmoehle@andreupalma.com;abcfleservice@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREU , JUAN G