This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/04/2023 at 19:27:25 (UTC).

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC V PAGE, WAKISHA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PAGE, WAKISHA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

PAGE , WAKISHA

SNEAD , DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/22/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

02/22/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4789318

02/23/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4789318

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/27/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/27/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/02/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/02/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

03/03/2023:ANSWER

PAID $2,700.00 ON RECEIPT 4813901

03/14/2023:PAID $2,700.00 ON RECEIPT 4813901

PAID $100.94 ON RECEIPT 4817039

03/15/2023:PAID $100.94 ON RECEIPT 4817039

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/20/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: 4/18/23 @1:30PM RM 2 JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 3/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4817039; Receipt Amount: $100.94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $3,005.94; total Amount Paid: $3,005.94; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/15/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $2.94; Amount Paid: $2.94; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/15/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $98.00; Amount Paid: $98.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $100.94 ON RECEIPT 4817039; Notes: $100.94 4817039 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4813901; Receipt Amount: $2,700.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/14/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $48.00; Amount Paid: $48.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/14/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $2,652.00; Amount Paid: $2,652.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $2,700.00 ON RECEIPT 4813901; Notes: $2,700.00 4813901 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4789318; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/23/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/23/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/23/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4789318; Notes: $205.00 4789318 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less