This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/28/2023 at 22:47:15 (UTC).

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC V HENANDEZ, ERNESTO

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HENANDEZ, ERNESTO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BEAMIF A LLC

ENTERPRISE INTL LLC

HENANDEZ , ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/19/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/19/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

01/19/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $936.00 ON RECEIPT 4748558

01/19/2023:PAID $936.00 ON RECEIPT 4748558

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

02/08/2023:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/14/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/21/2023:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR ORDER

02/21/2023:MOTION FOR ORDER

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

02/22/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4786992

02/22/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4786992

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/22/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4786992; Receipt Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $946.00; total Amount Paid: $946.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

FinancialDue Date: 02/22/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4786992; Notes: $10.00 4786992 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes: DIRECTING DFT TO FILE A REPLY TO COMPLAINT. F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com AS TO DFT ENTERPRISE INT'L LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED: 01/31/2023 BEAMIF A LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: ENTERPRISES LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B DFT ERNESTO HERNANDEZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
01/19/2023

FinancialDue Date: 01/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

FinancialDue Date: 01/19/2023; Description: 800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due: $906.00; Amount Paid: $906.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $936.00 ON RECEIPT 4748558; Notes: $936.00 4748558 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com ISSUED TO ERNESTO HERNANDEZ EFILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com ISSUED TO ENTERPRISE INTL INC EFILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com ISSUED TO BEAMIF A LLC EFILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less