This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/11/2019 at 14:55:28 (UTC).

JORDAN, STACEY V AVIALL INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO VAN DUSEN AIRCRAFT SUPPLIES

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 JORDAN, STACEY filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against AVIALL INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO VAN DUSEN AIRCRAFT SUPPLIES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JORDAN , STACEY

JORDAN , SUSANNE

Defendants and Respondents

BENNETT AUTO SUPPLY INC

BOEING COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FENDER MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES LLC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

AVIALL INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO VAN DUSEN AIRCRAFT SUPPLIES

TEXTRON AVIATION INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BEECHCRAFT CORPORATION CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY AND MCCAULEY AIRCRAFT PRODUCTS

YAMAHA GUITAR GROUP INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE AMPEG COMPANY INC

MCCORD CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FERRARO JR, JAMES L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHAPIRO , ARI

PAZOS , LUCIA V

STURGE , CLARKE S

TARLOW , DAVID M

ALLEY , TODD C

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE

MELARAGNO , PETER J

COXHEAD ESQ, STEPHEN

UPSHAW , ANTHONY N

IOVINO , CAROLINE M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/09/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/10/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/20/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/15/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/11/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/25/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/22/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/21/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/20/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/20/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/13/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR THE BOEING COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ATTY VOLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR AVIALL INC AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL FILED BY ATTY VOLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:DEFENDANT, FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:DEFENDANT, PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • UNVOID RECEIPT; Notes:3072267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO YAMAHA GUITAR GROUP INC ONLY - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:PETER J. MELARAGNO ESQ., OF THE LAW FIRM OF FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P.A, OBO DFT S MCCORD CORP. AND TEXTRON AVIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • VOIDED RECEIPT 3072267; Notes:3072267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • REVISED RECEIPT 3072267 CREATED $10 OVERAGE; Notes:3072267 CREATED $10 OVERAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Due Date:01/30/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less