This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 19:49:24 (UTC).

JONES, EARNEST V CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 JONES, EARNEST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JONES , EARNEST

Respondents and Defendants

CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

ROBINSON , CHESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEBERGAL , MARC L

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

STELLA , ANTHONY M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/11/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/11/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/11/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4385580

03/15/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4385580

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF F/B DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:F/B DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY ANTHONY M. STELLA, ESQ. OBO DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY ANTHONY M. STELLA, ESQ. OBO DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CITY OF WEST - 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4385580; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/15/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/15/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/15/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST DFT CHESTER ROBINSON F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST TO DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:INSURANCE TO DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT CHESTER ROBINSON F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO CHESTER ROBINSON EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bebergal, Marc L