This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 01/30/2019 at 17:32:09 (UTC).

JOHNSON, TAMMY LYNNE

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 JOHNSON, TAMMY LYNNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HYETT , MICHAEL A

Not Classified By Court

HYETT , MICHAEL

Decedent

JOHNSON , TAMMY LYNNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

HYETT , MICHAEL A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • WILL BOOK 30348 PAGE 1105-1113; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 10-30-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30348 PAGE 1114-1114; Notes:MICHAEL A. HYETT HAS BEEN APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SIGNED JUDGE JB KEYSER 01-03-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE SIGNED JUDGE JB KEYSER 01-03-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PAID $12.00 ON RECEIPT 2979935; Notes:$12.00 2979935 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2973005; Notes:$401.00 2973005 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IB: Probate Central, MH, Guardianship - IB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • OATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B MICHAEL A HYETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY HYETT OBO MICHAEL A HYETT PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Receipt Number:2979935; Receipt Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Receipt Number:2973005; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$413.00; total Amount Paid:$413.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Due Date:01/03/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$12.00; Amount Paid:$12.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Due Date:12/27/2018; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less