This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/12/2019 at 15:04:17 (UTC).

JOHNSON, MARY A. V DAVIS, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 JOHNSON, MARY A filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JOHNSON , MARY A.

Respondent and Defendant

DAVIS , JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/08/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/31/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

07/19/2019:E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30769 PAGE 398-399

07/19/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30769 PAGE 398-399

CLERK'S DEFAULT

07/19/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/19/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/19/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/12/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/12/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/10/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

07/08/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3239434

07/08/2019:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3239434

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO JENNIFER DAVIS. POSTED ON 8/2/19; EXECUTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30769 PAGE 398-399; Notes:FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THE FILE. SIGNED ON 7/19/19 BY JDG S. COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO JENNIFER DAVIS. SUBSTITUTE(JAMARI BURRIS) SERVED ON 7/9/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO JENNIFER DAVIS. SUBSTITUTE(JAMARI BURRIS) SERVED ON 7/9/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3239434; Notes:$205.00 3239434 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Receipt Number:3239434; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$205.00; total Amount Paid:$205.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Due Date:07/08/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Due Date:07/08/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less