This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/24/2022 at 18:27:28 (UTC).

JOHNSON, DEWARO V ASSURED CONTRACTING LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 JOHNSON, DEWARO filed an Other lawsuit against ASSURED CONTRACTING LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOHNSON , DEWARO

Defendants and Respondents

ASSURED CONTRACTING LLC

BARRETT ELECTRIC INC

BERNARD , HUGH

GOLDMARK , LINDA

GOLDMARK , ROBERT

HUGH BERNARD ELECTRIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RIEGER , JACQUELYN V

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WADSWORTH , CHRISTOPHER W

KOVEN , IAN L

BUCKNER , MICHAEL L

BERGER , EVAN B

LEVINE ESQ, ALLEN M

 

Court Documents

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/03/2022:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

01/18/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/18/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

01/13/2022:ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

01/13/2022:STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/13/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

CERTIFICATE

01/03/2022:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

12/10/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/03/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

12/03/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

12/03/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

12/03/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

12/02/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING ZOOM VIDEO DEPOSITION DEWARO JOHNSON 04/14/2022 01:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ASSURED CONTRACTING LLC SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES OF RECORDS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES OF RECORDS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL; Notes:MARX DTD 1/13/22 : IAN L. KOVEN, ESQ. IS SUBSTITUTED FOR CAROLINE M. CAROLLO, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DFT BARRETT ELECTRIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Notes:FOR BARRETT ELECTRIC INC FILED BY THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR BARRETT ELECTRIC INC AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ATTY KOVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTI FF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:PLAINTI FF'S REQUEST FOR ADMI SSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4042221; Receipt Amount: $403.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/26/2021; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/26/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $403.50 ON RECEIPT 4042221; Notes:$403.50 4042221 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIEGER , JACQUELYN V