This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 22:59:05 (UTC).

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC V LOUIS, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOUIS, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

LOUIS , ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/29/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694861

11/30/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694861

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/07/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/27/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

12/27/2022

DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: FB PLT-

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED ELIZABETH LOUIS - 12/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

FinancialReceipt Number: 4694861; Receipt Amount: $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

FinancialDue Date: 11/30/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

FinancialDue Date: 11/30/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694861; Notes: $195.00 4694861 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less