This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 00:28:00 (UTC).

JEANTEL, LOUIS V JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 JEANTEL, LOUIS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JEANTEL , LOUIS

JEANTEL , JOYEUSE

Defendants and Respondents

CORTOLILLO MD, NICHOLAS

WEST PALM BEACH PHYSICIAN GROUP INC

ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICINE SERVICES LLC

FLORIDA ACUTE CARE SERVICES

REZWAN MD, ABU

ENVISION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

TEAM HEALTH HOLDINGS LLC

JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

EMCARE HOLDINGS INC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ACKER , MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LUNDEEN , A SCOTT

CITRON , HOWARD L

SHURMAN , JESSE L

LEWELLEN , LORI B

KNAPP , SCOTT D

SCHWEBEL , MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

03/29/2019:CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

03/29/2019:CERTIFICATE

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/12/2019:MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/25/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/14/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/14/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

02/14/2019:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/14/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/14/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/06/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

02/06/2019:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ACCEPTANCE

01/22/2019:ACCEPTANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/14/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/14/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/20/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:NOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMENTS OBTAINED PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P., 1.351(C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF NON OBJECTION AND COMPLIANCE WITH HIPAA F/B DFT JFK MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO WEST PALM BEACH PHYSICIAN GROUP INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO ABU REZWAN M.D F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICINE SERVICE, LLC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO FLORIDA ACUTE CARE SERVICES AKA FLACS OF TEAMHEALTH F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Due Date:11/16/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less