This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 21:21:10 (UTC).

JEAN CHARLES, RICARDO V SEXTON, CALEB

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 JEAN CHARLES, RICARDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEXTON, CALEB. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JEAN CHARLES , RICARDO

Defendant and Respondent

SEXTON , CALEB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOROWITZ , CHAD N

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FORTUNATO , RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/18/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4253600

11/18/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4253600

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/07/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/19/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/19/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER

12/24/2021:ANSWER

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/04/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/04/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/04/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, RICARDO JEAN CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO COMPLAINT F/B ATTY RAPHAEL FORTUNATO OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FILED BY ATTY FORTUNATO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FILED BY ATTY FORTUNATO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE CALEB SEXTON - 12/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4253600; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/18/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/18/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4253600; Notes:$411.00 4253600 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:horowitzlaw@bellsouth.net AS TO CALEB SEXTON EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad, Horowitz, ESQ.