This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/21/2023 at 22:46:25 (UTC).

JD RESTORATION INC (A/A/O KEVIN PISANO) V STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 JD RESTORATION INC A/A/O KEVIN PISANO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JD RESTORATION INC (A/A/O KEVIN PISANO)

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WEISSER , KEVIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GREEN , JAY

 

Court Documents

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4741412

01/12/2023:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4741412

NOTICE OF FILING

01/12/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

RECEIPT OF

01/12/2023:RECEIPT OF

CERTIFIED COPY

01/12/2023:CERTIFIED COPY

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CA

01/10/2023:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CA

CERTIFIED COPY

01/10/2023:CERTIFIED COPY

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

06/28/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER TO TRANSFER

06/28/2022:ORDER TO TRANSFER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/22/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/20/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4478684

06/01/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4478684

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4478684

05/25/2022:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4478684

NOTICE OF FILING

05/24/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/24/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/24/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/24/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4741412; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $401.00; total Amount Paid: $401.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4741412; Notes: $401.00 4741412 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: CLERKS TRANSFERRED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: DOCKET SHEET OF COUNTY CASE 50-2022-SC-008143-XXXX-MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CA; Notes: TRANSFER CASE TO CA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/28/2022 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/28/2022 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4478684; Notes: $320.00 4478684 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: STATEMENT OF CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: AS TO ANY ALL WITNESS DESIGNATED AS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES FOR 10/6/22 AT 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST TO DFT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less