This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/06/2022 at 19:02:58 (UTC).

ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS V FLEUR, VITNELSON SAINT

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLEUR, VITNELSON SAINT. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DORE , SANDY

FLEUR , VITNELSON SAINT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/27/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4662669

10/28/2022:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4662669

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

11/07/2022:ANSWER

MOTION F/B DFT

11/07/2022:MOTION F/B DFT

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4673296

11/07/2022:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4673296

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/08/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/08/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/18/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: SANDY DORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: VITNELSON SAINT FLEUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketISSUED/NOT PROCESSED; Notes: IMAGE NOT AVAILABLE **SYSTEM ERROR**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketISSUED/NOT PROCESSED; Notes: IMAGE NOT AVAILABLE **SYSTEM ERROR**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4673296; Receipt Amount: $0.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.30; total Amount Paid: $205.30; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/07/2022; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $0.30; Amount Paid: $0.30; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4673296; Notes: $0.30 4673296 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4662669; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/28/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4662669; Notes: $205.00 4662669 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISLAND SHORES APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Investment LLC, 21st Avenue is a litigant

Latest cases where JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JERRON KELLEY