This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:25:18 (UTC).

INDIVIGLIO, BRANDON V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 INDIVIGLIO, BRANDON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INDIVIGLIO , BRANDON

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

EDWARDS , JOHN D

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CAMPBELL , LINDA L

JACKSON , JASMINE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/25/2022:COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/25/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/25/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/25/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/25/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

03/25/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4403314

03/29/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4403314

ACCEPTANCE

04/11/2022:ACCEPTANCE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/22/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/22/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY LINDA CAMPBELL OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 04/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Notes: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4403314; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/29/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4403314; Notes: $411.00 4403314 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jedwards@kpattorney.com;jsoto@kpattorney.com;FirstPartyEService@kpattorney.com AS TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY EDWARDS OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: VIDEO DUCES TECUM OF DFTS FIELD ADJUSTER DIRLOU GARNIER ON TBD @ TBD F/B ATTY EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: VIDEO DUCES TECUM OF DFTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ON TBD @ TBD F/B ATTY EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, John Daniel