This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/22/2019 at 15:05:25 (UTC).

IBIS RESERVE CORP V WALKER, LATOREYA M

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 IBIS RESERVE CORP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WALKER, LATOREYA M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

IBIS RESERVE CORP

Defendants and Respondents

WALKER , LATOREYA M

SMITH , EMANUEL

WALKER , LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/19/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/06/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31006 PAGE 1188-1188

11/04/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31006 PAGE 1188-1188

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/31/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/31/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/28/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/28/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $215.00 ON RECEIPT 3379361

10/21/2019:PAID $215.00 ON RECEIPT 3379361

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/18/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON 11/7/19 TO LATOREYA M WALKER, EMANUEL SMITH, LINDA WALKER AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31006 PAGE 1188-1188; Notes:FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT ( POSSESSION) JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/4/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:SERVICE@BARFIELDPA.COM ENTERED AGAINST DFT LINDA. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:SERVICE@BARFIELDPA.COM ENTERED AGAINST DFT EMANUEL. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:SERVICE@BARFIELDPA.COM ENTERED AGAINST DFT LATOREYA. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AS TO LATOREYA M WALKER , EMANUEL SMITH, LINDA WALKER AND AFFIDAVIT ON NON PAYMENT OF RENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:DEFAULT -FOR EVICTION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AS TO LATOREYA M WALKER,EMANUEL SMITH, LINDA WALKER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com LINDA WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:dsetaro@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;service@barfieldpa.com EMANUEL SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Receipt Number:3379361; Receipt Amount: $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$215.00; total Amount Paid:$215.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Due Date:10/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Due Date:10/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Due Date:10/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Due Date:10/21/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less