This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 01:46:29 (UTC).

HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK V SZYNDLAR, BARBARA J

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SZYNDLAR, BARBARA J. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK

Defendants and Respondents

OAKS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SZYNDLAR , GARRY J

SUN TERRACE AT THE OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

REPUBLIC CREDIT ONE LP

MCRAE , CHRISTOPHER T

SZYNDLAR , BARBARA J

Intervenor

104 ANDOVER COURT LLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CASSIDY , TAYLOR N

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BACHOVE , EVAN R

MCRAE , CHRISTOPHER T

ROSIN ESQ, ANDREW W

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING PAYOFF OF SUBJECT MORTGAGE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT)

08/02/2019:MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING PAYOFF OF SUBJECT MORTGAGE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT)

REPLY/RESPONSE

05/15/2019:REPLY/RESPONSE

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/29/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CLERK'S DEFAULT

04/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

ORDER J KEYSER DTD. 4/3/19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED.

04/03/2019:ORDER J KEYSER DTD. 4/3/19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED.

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

04/01/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/01/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING

03/27/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/30/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/30/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

STATEMENT

01/25/2019:STATEMENT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/02/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/24/2018:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2018:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/11/2018:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:OF THE AFFIDAVIT OF PLTS COUNSEL AS TO ATTYS TIME AND COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTYS FEES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING PAYOFF OF SUBJECT MORTGAGE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT); Notes:TO STAY ACTION PENDING PAYOFF OF SUBJECT MORTGAGE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO INTERVENE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT); Notes:TO INTERVENE (F/B INTERVENOR 104 ANDOVER COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:THE AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING TOGETHER WITH BUSINESS RECORDS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Notes:OF FORECLOSURE AND RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST LOAN INSTRUMENTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:GARRY J SZYNDLAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO DFTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER; Notes:THE AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFTS GARRY SZYNDLAR & BARBARA SZYNDLAR PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:BARBARA J SZYNDLAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS. MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$9.00; Amount Paid:$9.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Due Date:11/29/2018; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less