This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/03/2023 at 22:44:44 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V MONTEIRO, RICARDO

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MONTEIRO, RICARDO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

BOCA LANDINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

ISPC

MONTEIRO , RICARDO

MOON LAKE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY

TOWN VILLAS AT MOON LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICARDO MONTEIRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUNER , CAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CONAWAY , EDITH

BELMUDEZ , SEAN P

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE REQUEST FOR FORBEARANCE (F/B RESPONDENT)

03/20/2023:NOTICE REQUEST FOR FORBEARANCE (F/B RESPONDENT)

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/22/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

02/22/2023:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

02/22/2023:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/22/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY D/B/A ISPC - 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TOWN VILLAS AT MOON LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC - 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BOCA LANDINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC F/K/A THE STARS AT MOON LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION - 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE - 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MOON LAKE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. F/K/A LAKERIDGE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC - 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ISPC - 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICARDO MONTEIRO - 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RICARDO MONTEIRO - 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REQUEST FOR FORBEARANCE (F/B RESPONDENT); Notes: REQUEST FOR FORBEARANCE (F/B RESPONDENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO COMPLAINT - F/B DFT MOON LAKE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO THE INDEPENDANT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILE@RASLG.COM;FLMAIL@RASLG.COM AS TO ISPC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICARDO MONTEIRO EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO RICARDO MONTEIRO EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34138 PAGE 858-858; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less