This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/04/2022 at 20:09:48 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ACE SECURITIES CORP HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2006 FM2 ASSET BACKED PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES V TELAMOUR, JACQUELINE

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ACE SECURITIES CORP HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2006 FM2 ASSET BACKED PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TELAMOUR, JACQUELINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DELGADO , LUIS and HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DELGADO , LUIS

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE IN TRUST FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF ACE SECURITIES CORP HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2006 FM2 ASSET BACKED PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES

Defendants and Respondents

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH FLORIDA

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC MIN#100194430001066110

ST FELIX , JUDE

TELAMOUR , JACQUELINE

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSALER , BRIAN L

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

NEEDELMAN , HEATHER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/05/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/05/2022:COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/05/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33769 PAGE 1912-1912

08/05/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33769 PAGE 1912-1912

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $968.60 ON RECEIPT 4567446

08/09/2022:PAID $968.60 ON RECEIPT 4567446

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/24/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/26/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND REQUEST FOR SURPLUS FILED BY CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT JACQUELINE TELAMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC - 08/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH, FLORIDA - 08/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JUDE ST. FELIX - 08/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JACQUELINE TELAMORE - 08/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4567446; Receipt Amount: $968.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $968.60; total Amount Paid: $968.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/09/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efile@popkinrosaler.com AS TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC MIN#100194430001066110 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efile@popkinrosaler.com AS TO CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH FLORIDA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efile@popkinrosaler.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESION #1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efile@popkinrosaler.com AS OT JUDE ST FELIX EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efile@popkinrosaler.com AS TO JACQUELINE TELAMORE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33769 PAGE 1912-1912; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosaler, Brian L