Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:59:43 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NA V MERILIEN, ETANDIEU

Case Summary

On 09/24/2012 HSBC BANK USA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MERILIEN, ETANDIEU. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HSBC BANK USA NA

Defendants and Respondents

MERILIEN, ETANDIEU

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ETANDIEU MERILIEN

MERILIEN, ILDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ILDA MERILIEN

PALM BEACH COUNTY

THOUSAND OAKS AT CONGRESS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

TENANT #1

TENANT #2

TENANT #3

TENANT #4

MERILIEN , ILDA

MERILIEN , ETANDIEU

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MOULTON ESQ, EUGENA

LEPIERRE ESQ, DALLAS S

LEWIS , LISA M

RUSHING , JOSEPH R

TILKA , KATHERINE E

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MUGAVERO , PHILLIP

STOLOFF , SCOTT A

ST JEAN , PIERRE A

 

Court Documents

VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27673 PAGE 946

07/14/2015:VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27673 PAGE 946

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/14/2015:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER GRANTING

06/05/2015:ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF SALE

05/19/2015:NOTICE OF SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

02/20/2015:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

ORDER

02/09/2015:ORDER

MOTION

02/02/2015:MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/30/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL

12/10/2014:MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL

MEDIATION REPORT

02/07/2014:MEDIATION REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/19/2013:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/14/2013:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFAULT

02/28/2013:DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/14/2013:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/12/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/12/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27688 PAGE 1177; Notes:ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.420(A)(2) AND 1.540(B)(5), CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETRING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE GRANTED SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 27 2015 IS HEREBY CANCELLED J KEYSER DTD 07/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27673 PAGE 946; Notes:ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.420(A)(2) AND 1.540(B)(5), CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE, CANCELLING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SETTING ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN 0RLGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS AND TO SUBSTITUTE PHOTOSTATIC COPIES IN THE COURT FILE GRANTED SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 27 2015 IS HEREBY CANCELLED R OFTEDAL DTD 07/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB1010766. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:JULY 21, 2015 AT 8:45 AM ROOM 4A F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2015
  • Receipt Number:CAMB1004509; Receipt Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714948; Receipt Amount: $4.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714948; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,174.10; total Amount Paid:$1,174.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Due Date:07/14/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Due Date:06/26/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Due Date:06/17/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$92.50; Amount Paid:$92.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOUSAND OAKS AT CONGRESS MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUGAVERO , PHILLIP

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOLOFF, SCOTT A