This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2019 at 17:33:54 (UTC).

HOFF, NICOLETTA ANN

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 HOFF, NICOLETTA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURTON , CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURTON , CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HOFF , MICHAEL

CORY , JOYCE

Decedent

HOFF , NICOLETTA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SLOAN , BARBARA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SLOAN, BARBARA A; Notes:REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SLOAN, BARBARA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • PETITIONER: HOFF, MICHAEL; Notes:Petitioner: HOFF, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Notes:S/B JDG C. BURTON DTD 02/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:S/B JDG C. BURTON DTD 02/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:S/B JDG C. BURTON DTD 02/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:JUDGE CHARLES BURTON 2/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • EXPARTE CLERKS MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PAID $16.00 ON RECEIPT 3025044; Notes:$16.00 3025044 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B PETR ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:F/B JANET SARLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DISCLOSURE; Notes:OF TRUST BENEFICIARIES F/B MICHAEL HOFF AND JOYCE CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY SLOAN OBO MICHAEL HOFF AND JOYCE CORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt Number:3025044; Receipt Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:2998795; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$362.00; total Amount Paid:$362.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Due Date:02/05/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$16.00; Amount Paid:$16.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Due Date:01/16/2019; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less