Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/10/2021 at 20:43:50 (UTC).

HMC ASSETS LLC SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS SEPARATE TRUSTEE OF CIVIC HOLDINGS III TRUST V ASSURED PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 HMC ASSETS LLC SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS SEPARATE TRUSTEE OF CIVIC HOLDINGS III TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ASSURED PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HMC ASSETS LLC SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS SEPARATE TRUSTEE OF CIVIC HOLDINGS III TRUST

Defendants and Respondents

TOWN OF LANTANA FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ASSURED PROPERTIES LLC

PALM BEACH COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MEDLEY , ASHLAND ROBERTS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BIALCZAK , DANIEL W

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ORDER

02/01/2021:MOTION FOR ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/14/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

12/18/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT

12/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/30/2020:CLERK'S DEFAULT

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/20/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER ENTERED ON NOVEMBER 2,2020 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASES AND

11/20/2020:NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER ENTERED ON NOVEMBER 2,2020 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASES AND

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/20/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/20/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE F/B PLT

08/07/2020:NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE F/B PLT

COMPLAINT

08/07/2020:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS BOOK 31656 PAGE 1055-1056

08/07/2020:LIS PENDENS BOOK 31656 PAGE 1055-1056

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/07/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/07/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes:MOTION FOR AN ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET VIRTUAL/REMOTE HEARING ZOOM HEARING 03/30/2021 08:15:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY: ASHLAND R. MEDLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL/UPDATED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF ITS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:ASHLAND@ASHLANDMEDLEYLAW.COM UNKNOWN TENANT 1 SEVED AS JEAN CHARLES AND UNKNOWNTENANT 2 SERVED AS MARIO JEAN BAPTISTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR DATA PRESERVATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER ENTERED ON NOVEMBER 2,2020 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASES AND; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER ENTERED ON NOVEMBER 2,2020 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF LEASES AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA JEAN CHARLES; UNKNOWN TENANT #2 NKA MARIO JEAN BAPTISTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA JEAN CHARLES UNKNOWN TENANT #2 NKA MARIO JEAN BAPTISTE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Notes:FORECLOSURE AND FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF RENTS AND LEASES

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLEservice@AshlandMedleyLaw.com;kat@ashlandmedleylaw.com;Ashland@AshlandMedleyLaw.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLEservice@AshlandMedleyLaw.com;kat@ashlandmedleylaw.com;Ashland@AshlandMedleyLaw.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLEservice@AshlandMedleyLaw.com;kat@ashlandmedleylaw.com;Ashland@AshlandMedleyLaw.com AS TO PALM BEACH COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLEservice@AshlandMedleyLaw.com;kat@ashlandmedleylaw.com;Ashland@AshlandMedleyLaw.com AS TO TOWN OF LANTANA FLORIDA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLEservice@AshlandMedleyLaw.com;kat@ashlandmedleylaw.com;Ashland@AshlandMedleyLaw.com AS TO ASSURED PROPERTIES LLC A/K/A ASSURED PROPERTIES LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE F/B PLT; Notes:OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:VERIFIED FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF RENTS AND LEASES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31656 PAGE 1055-1056; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TOWN OF LANTANA is a litigant

Latest cases where HMC Assets LLC solely and in its capacity as separate Trustee of Ccommunity Development I Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIALCZAK , DANIEL WILLIAM