This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/20/2021 at 17:37:21 (UTC).

HIMMELRICH, CHARLES B.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 HIMMELRICH, CHARLES B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BURTON , CHARLES E and MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BURTON , CHARLES E

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HIMMELRICH , SHELLEY P.

Decedent

HIMMELRICH , CHARLES B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KATZ , THOMAS O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT THE AVOVE LISTED ITEMS ARE REQUIRED TO BE FILED WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER; JUDGE JAMES L MARTZ - DTD 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes:OPENING CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR ADMIN F/B JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875976; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3875976; Notes:$401.00 3875976 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/P SHELLY P. HIMMELRICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERS REP & DESIG & ACCEPT OF RES AGENT. DESIG THOMAS O. KATZ, ESQ. F/P SHELLY P. HIMMELRICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/P SHELLY P. HIMMELRICH E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY. KATZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:F/P SHELLY P. HIMMELRICH E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/P SHELLY P. HIMMELRICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IY: South Branch Probate - IY (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less