This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/13/2021 at 19:52:17 (UTC).

HILLMAN, TAMMY V RBC CAPITAL MARKETS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 HILLMAN, TAMMY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against RBC CAPITAL MARKETS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HILLMAN , TAMMY

Defendants and Respondents

RBC CAPITAL MARKETS LLC

RUCKART , RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZUCKERBROD , TODD A

 

Court Documents

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

07/23/2021:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/22/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4100035

07/12/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4100035

PETITION

07/09/2021:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF SETTING REMOTE HEARING (UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR) 09/02/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF SETTING REMOTE HEARING 8/26/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4100035; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/12/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4100035; Notes:$401.00 4100035 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RBC Capital Markets LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zuckerbrod, Todd Alan