This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 21:57:37 (UTC).

HIGHSMITH, HARYY V CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 HIGHSMITH, HARYY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HIGHSMITH , FLORETA

HIGHSMITH , HARYY

Defendant and Respondent

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , SIURY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MILLER , HOLLY K

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/03/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/03/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/03/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/03/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4452387

05/04/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4452387

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4457108

05/09/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4457108

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/22/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: OBO DFT F/B ATTY H MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4457108; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/09/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4457108; Notes: $10.00 4457108 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@glglawoffice.com;claims@glglawoffice.com AS TO DFT CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4452387; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/04/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4452387; Notes: $401.00 4452387 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: REQUEST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodriguez, Siury