This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/23/2022 at 16:10:10 (UTC).

HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC (PATIENT TASNIM MRIDHA) V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC PATIENT TASNIM MRIDHA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC (PATIENT: TASNIM MRIDHA)

Respondent and Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTENSEN , CHAD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/13/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4612869

09/14/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4612869

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/05/2022:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4612869; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/14/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 10/11/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 10/11/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4612869; Notes: $90.00 4612869 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY CHIROPRACTIC PLLC (PATIENT: TAMMIE T. PERKINS) is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTENSEN , CHAD