This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2023 at 22:46:24 (UTC).

HENLEY, SHANIQUE V PENNEY OPCO LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 HENLEY, SHANIQUE filed an Other lawsuit against PENNEY OPCO LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL , CAROLYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL , CAROLYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HENLEY , SHANIQUE

Defendant and Respondent

PENNEY OPCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRESSLER , IAN M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SZABO , JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/18/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/18/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/18/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4746895

01/18/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4746895

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/25/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/26/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/26/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/26/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: (FIRST) TO PLT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: (PERSONAL INJURY INTERROGATORIES TO PLT. F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: FILED BY ATTY SZABO OBO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PENNEY OPCO LLC - 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4746895; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/18/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/18/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4746895; Notes: $411.00 4746895 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com AS TO PENNY OPCO LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DFT PENNY OPCO LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less