This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/18/2021 at 20:00:26 (UTC).

HEDGER, ERICA V SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 HEDGER, ERICA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HEDGER , SCOTT

HEDGER , ERICA

Defendant and Respondent

SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CLARK , JEREMY

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/01/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3878084

01/19/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3878084

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/14/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT

01/14/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP, INC DBA SCHUMACHER CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM OF DELRAY - 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3878084; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/19/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/19/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3878084; Notes:$411.00 3878084 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jeremy@tampabayfloridalawyers.com;defend@tampabayfloridalawyers.com;Service@tampabayfloridalawyers.com SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC DBA SCHUMACHER CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM OF DELRAY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:& DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHUMACHER AUTO GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK , JEREMY