This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 11/10/2022 at 01:11:47 (UTC).

HEALTHSOURCE OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, LLC DBA HEALTHSOURCE OF NINE MILE (PATIENT KATIE M BRADLEY) V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 HEALTHSOURCE OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, LLC DBA HEALTHSOURCE OF NINE MILE PATIENT KATIE M BRADLEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HEALTHSOURCE OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, LLC DBA HEALTHSOURCE OF NINE MILE (PATIENT: KATIE M BRADLEY)

Respondent and Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

DE GIORGIO , MARIANGELA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/13/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/13/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4613051

09/14/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4613051

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/07/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

11/07/2022:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes: SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: FB DFT'S ATTY MARIANGELA DE GIORGIO DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4613051; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/14/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 11/8/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 11/8/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4613051; Notes: $185.00 4613051 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHSOURCE OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN