This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/13/2022 at 16:08:34 (UTC).

HARRIS, BRITTANY V DANIELS, EDDIE

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 HARRIS, BRITTANY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DANIELS, EDDIE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARRIS , BRITTANY

Defendant and Respondent

DANIELS , EDDIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: CORRECTED AS TO END DATE ON IMJUNCTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ DTD 12/12/2022. DE #'S 18 TO BE SERVED BY PBSO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPETITION; Notes: BY AFFIDAVIT FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR VIOLATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PROTEDCTION AGAINST STALKING. F/B PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: (CORRECTED AS TO END DATE) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE (AFTER NOTICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ DTD 12/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • HearingDVHR - DVRV HEARING; Location: WB; Room: #1 (West Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes: DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33995 PAGE 139-139; Notes: OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE. SIGNED ON 12/1/22 BY JDG S. ALIJEWICZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S MEMO OF DISPOSITION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO EDDIE DANIELS. SERVED ON 11/29/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S ORDER TEMP INJ; Notes: AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE. DOH: 12/1/22 BY JDG. S. ALIJEWICZ. PBSO TO SERVE DE#5, 9, & 10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE INFO SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE INFO SHEET; Notes: F/B PET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes: F/B PET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes: F/B PET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Notes: FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING. F/B PET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketORDER OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Notes: FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE. DOH: 12/1/22 @ 1:30PM. SIGNED ON 11/23/22 BY JDG S. ALIJEWICZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSET FOR DVHR - DVRV HEARING 12/1/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA; Notes: DVHR - DVRV HEARING 12/1/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: FW: West Branch Family - FW (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less