Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/14/2021 at 23:58:08 (UTC).

HAGAN, PIERCESON V GORDON, JAMES

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 HAGAN, PIERCESON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GORDON, JAMES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTZ , JAMES L and GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MARTZ , JAMES L

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HAGAN , PIERCESON

Defendants and Respondents

GORDON , JAMES

GORDON , JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAKED , SAGI

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BALDUCCI , MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/02/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3863982

01/06/2021:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3863982

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3857807

12/30/2020:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3857807

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/23/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/23/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/23/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

12/23/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION AND EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY BALDUCCI OBO DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUDITH GORDON - 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JAMES GORDON - 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3863982; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/06/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/06/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3863982; Notes:$20.00 3863982 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:sagi@shakedlaw.com;filingcourtdocuments@gmail.com TO BE SERVED ON JUDITH GORDON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:sagi@shakedlaw.com;filingcourtdocuments@gmail.com TO BE SERVED ON JAMES GORDON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/30/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3857807; Notes:$401.00 3857807 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:FIRST TO DFT JUDITH GORDON F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:FIRST TO DFT JAMES GORDON F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST TO DFT JAMES GORDON F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT JUDITH GORDON F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT JAMES GORDON F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaked, Sagi