This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/20/2019 at 23:06:49 (UTC).

H BECK INC V WILDE, MAURICE C

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 H BECK INC filed an Other lawsuit against WILDE, MAURICE C. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

H BECK INC

Defendant and Respondent

WILDE , MAURICE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

D'AMURA , RICHARD A

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

08/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

ORDER MARTZ DTD 7/10/2019 H BECK INC SECOND MOTION FOR AN ENLAREMENT OF TIME TO EFFECTIVE SERVICE IS HEREBY GRANTED. *****VIEW ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS*****

07/11/2019:ORDER MARTZ DTD 7/10/2019 H BECK INC SECOND MOTION FOR AN ENLAREMENT OF TIME TO EFFECTIVE SERVICE IS HEREBY GRANTED. *****VIEW ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS*****

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

06/20/2019:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/10/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/04/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/04/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER SASSER; PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECUATES SERVICE DTD 4/9/2019 ( SEE ORDER)

04/09/2019:ORDER SASSER; PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECUATES SERVICE DTD 4/9/2019 ( SEE ORDER)

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/03/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION F/B PETITIONER UP 4/1/19

03/29/2019:MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION F/B PETITIONER UP 4/1/19

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30509 PAGE 1993-1994

03/29/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30509 PAGE 1993-1994

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/28/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER SASSER DTD 3/18/19 DIRECTING PLT TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON DFTS THE PLT IS DIRECTED WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EITHER SERVE PROCESS ON THE DFTS

03/18/2019:ORDER SASSER DTD 3/18/19 DIRECTING PLT TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON DFTS THE PLT IS DIRECTED WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EITHER SERVE PROCESS ON THE DFTS

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3013876

01/28/2019:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3013876

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2909861

11/06/2018:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2909861

PETITION

11/01/2018:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/01/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:AND INQUIRY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER MARTZ DTD 7/10/2019 H BECK INC SECOND MOTION FOR AN ENLAREMENT OF TIME TO EFFECTIVE SERVICE IS HEREBY GRANTED. *****VIEW ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS*****; Notes:MARTZ DTD 7/10/2019 H BECK INC SECOND MOTION FOR AN ENLAREMENT OF TIME TO EFFECTIVE SERVICE IS HEREBY GRANTED. *****VIEW ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:FOURTH RE-NOTICE OF HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO JUDICIAL DIVISION REQUEST CANCELS HEARING OF JUNE 26, 2019 07/10/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:THIRD NOTICE OF HEARING 06/26/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:TUESDAY JUNE 11, 2019 8:45 AM ROOM 10 A RE: MOTION FOR GOOD CAUSE FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON RESPONDENT F/B PETITIONER H. BECK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:(SECOND) TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON RESPONDENT F/B PETITIONER H. BECK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SASSER; PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECUATES SERVICE DTD 4/9/2019 ( SEE ORDER); Notes:SASSER; PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECUATES SERVICE DTD 4/9/2019 ( SEE ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 04/09/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION F/B PETITIONER UP 4/1/19; Notes:FOR RECONSIDERATION F/B PETITIONER UP 4/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:rdamura@dz-pllc.com AS TO MAURICE C WILDE EFO;ED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2909861; Notes:$401.00 2909861 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Receipt Number:3013876; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Receipt Number:2909861; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Due Date:11/06/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'AMURA RICHARD