This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2021 at 19:02:35 (UTC).

GULFSTREAM HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER INC AAO CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS V INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 GULFSTREAM HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER INC AAO CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GULFSTREAM HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER INC AAO CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS

Respondent and Defendant

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUTIN , BRITTNEY CECILIA

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GARCIA , LILIANA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/14/2021:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/14/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/14/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213379

10/15/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213379

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/25/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

11/08/2021:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

11/10/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

PRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER

11/12/2021:PRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (IF NOT AGREED BUT ORDERED BY COURT)

11/15/2021:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (IF NOT AGREED BUT ORDERED BY COURT)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (IF NOT AGREED BUT ORDERED BY COURT); Notes:JUDGE CORLEW 11/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER; Notes:JUDGE CORLEW ON 11/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes:AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B LILIANA GARCIA ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY VIA FLA CFO - 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4213379; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:BGUTIN@SHANESTAFFORD.COM SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 11/9/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 11/9/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213379; Notes:$185.00 4213379 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSTREAM HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER INC A/A/O NICXIE ADEA is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUTIN , BRITTNEY C