This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 22:33:26 (UTC).

GUDZINSKIY, ANDREY V NAPOLI, LISA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 GUDZINSKIY, ANDREY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NAPOLI, LISA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUDZINSKIY , ANDREY

Defendant and Respondent

NAPOLI , LISA

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER VACATING BOOK 34127 PAGE 1278-1278

02/15/2023:ORDER VACATING BOOK 34127 PAGE 1278-1278

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/15/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY. SIGNED ON 2/15/23 BY JDG. S. ALIJEWICZ.

02/15/2023:ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY. SIGNED ON 2/15/23 BY JDG. S. ALIJEWICZ.

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/15/2023:EMERGENCY MOTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/02/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34078 PAGE 1091-1091

01/17/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34078 PAGE 1091-1091

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/13/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/09/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/03/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/03/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/22/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4718709

12/21/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4718709

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694167

11/29/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694167

NOTICE OF FILING

11/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

11/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS LACKS ADA LANGUAGE PER AO 2.207 AND PROPER LANGUAGE FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS SUMMONS.

11/28/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS LACKS ADA LANGUAGE PER AO 2.207 AND PROPER LANGUAGE FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS SUMMONS.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO LISA NAPOLI. POSTED ON 2/9/23; EXECUTED ON 2/14/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER VACATING BOOK 34127 PAGE 1278-1278; Notes: ORDER STAYING WRIT. SIGN BY JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 2/15/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO LISA NAPOLI. POSTED ON 2/9/23; EXECUTED ON 2/14/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY. SIGNED ON 2/15/23 BY JDG. S. ALIJEWICZ.; Notes: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY. SIGNED ON 2/15/23 BY JDG. S. ALIJEWICZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Notes: F/B DFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34078 PAGE 1091-1091; Notes: OF EVICTION - SIGNED JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 1/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: OF EVICTION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/29/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4694167; Notes: $195.00 4694167 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: FLORIDA NOTICE TO QUIT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS LACKS ADA LANGUAGE PER AO 2.207 AND PROPER LANGUAGE FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS SUMMONS.; Notes: gudzinskiy@gmail.com;gudzinskiy@gmail.com;gudzinskiy@gmail.com SUMMONS LACKS ADA LANGUAGE PER AO 2.207 AND PROPER LANGUAGE FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS SUMMONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less