This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/14/2019 at 17:33:36 (UTC).

GROSBERG, MERWIN K

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 GROSBERG, MERWIN K was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TICKTIN , JESSICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TICKTIN , JESSICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLOOM , SUSAN G

Decedent

GROSBERG , MERWIN K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OSBORNE , R BRAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • PROOF OF SERV NOTICE OF ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY FANZLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL; Notes:RBO@OSBORNEPA.COM; AJF@OSBORNEPA.COM CASE # 2019CP000144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B R BRADY OSBORNE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PROOF; Notes:OF WILL - F/B SUSAN BLOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • EXPARTE CLERKS MEMO; Notes:JUDGE J TICKTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B ANDREW R COMITER ESQ AND ANTONIO P ROMANO ESQ OBO RONNA TALCOTT AND KENT TALCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2993124; Notes:$401.00 2993124 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Notes:F/B SUSAN BLOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Notes:F/B KEVIN BANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:F/B SUSAN BLOOM & KEVIN BANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF P/R, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B SUSAN BLOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B R BRADY OSBORNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B R BRADY OSBORNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • WILL; Notes:E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B SUSAN BLOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Receipt Number:2993124; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less