This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/22/2019 at 17:40:46 (UTC).

GREENE, JEFFREY V LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 GREENE, JEFFREY filed an Other lawsuit against LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Counter Defendants, Respondents and Plaintiffs

GREENE , MEI SZE

GREENE , JEFFREY

SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING INC

Defendants and Respondents

SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

KERNEY & ASSOCIATES, INC.

TEELE & ASSOCIATES, INC.

CORROSIVE SOLUTIONS INC

BRIDGES, MARSH & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendants, Respondents, Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

GREENE , MEI SZE

LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

KERNEY & ASSOCIATES, INC.

GREENE , JEFFREY

TEELE & ASSOCIATES, INC.

CORROSIVE SOLUTIONS INC

BRIDGES, MARSH & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Counter Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING INC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Petitioner, Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

SOUCY ESQ, BRENDEN D

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

KADYSZEWSKI , RYAN V

SOUCY ESQ, BRENDEN D

GUMMER , JADE M

SHEEHAN , NOELLE K

SMITH III, BURKS A

LURVEY , JOHN A

BRANDT JR, ALAN C PETER

HOWARD , JOHN A

HELF , JAMES S

CHIOCCA , JOHN A

CRUZ , JORGE L

WILDMAN , ALEXANDER L

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

11/07/2017:CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

11/06/2017:CERTIFICATE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/18/2017:REQUEST FOR COPIES

AGREED ORDER ON DFT BRIDGES MARSH & ASSOCIATES INC'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION BMA MUST FILE AN ANSWER TO THE PLT'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT W/ IN 20 DAYS; BMA WILL PARTICIPATE FULLY IN DISCOVERY; MEDIATION WILL OCCUR W/ IN 6 MONTHS; BMA MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION RESERVES RULING THIS RESERVATION IS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF PLT OR DFT TO BE HEARD D HAFELE DTD 5/9/17

05/10/2017:AGREED ORDER ON DFT BRIDGES MARSH & ASSOCIATES INC'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION BMA MUST FILE AN ANSWER TO THE PLT'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT W/ IN 20 DAYS; BMA WILL PARTICIPATE FULLY IN DISCOVERY; MEDIATION WILL OCCUR W/ IN 6 MONTHS; BMA MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION RESERVES RULING THIS RESERVATION IS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF PLT OR DFT TO BE HEARD D HAFELE DTD 5/9/17

CERTIFICATE

03/29/2017:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/16/2017:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/07/2017:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/01/2017:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/10/2017:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/10/2017:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2017:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

12/28/2016:REQUEST FOR COPIES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/22/2016:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/19/2016:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/16/2016:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/01/2016:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/21/2016:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2016:CIVIL COVER SHEET

195 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE OF LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE OF TEELE & ASSOCIATES INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE CDFT, JEFFREY GREENE AND MEI SZE GREENE F\B SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE OF KERNEY & ASSOCIATES INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE OF SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE OF CORROSIVE SOLUTIONS INC FILED BY PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: OBO BRIDGES, MARSH & ASSOCIATES INC F/B ATTY CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:DECEMBER 22, 2017 THROUGH JANUARY 2, 2018 F/B ATTY GUERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION REPORT; Notes:ADJOURNED F/B MEDIATOR FREUD

    Read MoreRead Less
204 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$858.50; total Amount Paid:$858.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Due Date:07/18/2017; Description:8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Due Date:11/29/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Due Date:11/28/2016; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Due Date:08/04/2016; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMYTH AIR CONDITIONING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kerney & Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan V Kadyszewski (esq)