Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/01/2021 at 15:04:48 (UTC).

GREEN HOME IMPROVEMENTS PLUS LLC V LATIMORE, EMMA

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 GREEN HOME IMPROVEMENTS PLUS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LATIMORE, EMMA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GREEN HOME IMPROVEMENTS PLUS LLC

Defendant and Respondent

LATIMORE , EMMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RAINES , ALAN LESTER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/15/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

COMPLAINT

02/25/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3927576

03/02/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3927576

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EMMA LATIMORE - 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3927576; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3927576; Notes:$310.00 3927576 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:araines@waschraines.com;eservice@waschraines.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN HOME IMPROVEMENT PLUS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raines, Alan Lester