Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/29/2021 at 19:52:34 (UTC).

GOOD, RANDI V AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 GOOD, RANDI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOOD , RANDI

Defendant and Respondent

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FELDMAN , BRETT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BUSTAMENTE , TIFFANY A

JOLICOEUR , ISABEL ROSE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3921135

02/24/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3921135

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/22/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/22/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/22/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ATTY JOLICOEUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3921135; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/24/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3921135; Notes:$411.00 3921135 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FILED BY RANDI GOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FILED BY RANDI GOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:FILED BY RANDI GOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:brett@brflegal.com TO BE SERVED ON AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FILED BY RANDI GOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bustamante, Tiffany A