This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 19:50:47 (UTC).

GMYREK, DANIEL V MURPHY OIL USA INC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 GMYREK, DANIEL filed an Other lawsuit against MURPHY OIL USA INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GMYREK , DANIEL

Defendant and Respondent

MURPHY OIL USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRESSLER , IAN M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JACOBS , BRITTANY

TUZZIO , GERARD A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/23/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/23/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/23/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4362577

02/25/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4362577

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/21/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

03/21/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

03/21/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/21/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/21/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/21/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/21/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES UPON PLAINTIFF DANIEL GMYREK F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF DANIEL GYREK F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF DANIEL GYREK F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B GERARD A TUZZIO ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B BRITTANY H JACOBS ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B BRITTANY H JACOBS ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MURPHY OIL USA INC - 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4362577; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/25/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/25/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4362577; Notes:$411.00 4362577 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com AS TO MURPHY OIL USA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRESSLER , IAN M