This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/19/2019 at 15:07:04 (UTC).

GIRONTA, ANTHONY M V WILLIAMS, DORETHA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 GIRONTA, ANTHONY M filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAMS, DORETHA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GIRONTA , ANTHONY M

Defendant and Respondent

WILLIAMS , DORETHA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/13/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31019 PAGE 421-422

11/08/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31019 PAGE 421-422

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/04/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/31/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/30/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/18/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/18/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3368721

10/15/2019:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3368721

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/15/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

10/15/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31019 PAGE 421-422; Notes:FOR POSSESSION DTD: 11/8/19 JUDGE CASTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:FOR FDT. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:COUNT I ONLY. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:5 DAYS- INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 10/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:20 DAYS- INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 10/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3368721; Notes:$320.00 3368721 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt Number:3368721; Receipt Amount: $115.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt Number:3368721; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$320.00; total Amount Paid:$320.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:400FF County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less